Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB3293 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2022

Amended

Bill March 23, 2022
Bill March 17, 2022
Bill March 5, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022