House
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 118, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1219).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 118, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1219).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 214-22) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 214-22).
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ganaden, Ichiyama, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Nishihara, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-22 5:00PM; CR 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-22 10:50AM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-22 10:45AM in conference room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-22 10:46AM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-22 10:46AM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Ganaden, Ichiyama, B. Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Kong, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Nishihara, Kidani Co-Chairs; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 508).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1778-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Holt, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-31-22 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Quinlan excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1323-22), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-22-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1105-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 03-16-22 10:00AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 505) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2874) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from HMS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2541) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
The committee(s) on HMS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to HMS/PSM, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|