Senate | 02/18/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2692) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, DeCoite, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | The committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 02-17-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-22 3:30PM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | Referred to TRS, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Introduced. |