Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB3334 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2022

Amended

Bill April 30, 2022
Bill March 22, 2022
Bill March 5, 2022
Bill February 14, 2022