Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB3372 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2022

Amended

Bill April 29, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022
Bill March 17, 2022
Bill February 11, 2022