House
|
04/29/2022
|
Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 929).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Senate Conferees Discharged: Senator Gabbard discharged as Chair. Senator Rhoads discharged as Co-Chair. Senators Fevella, Acasio discharged as Conferees.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-22 8:35AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 8:40AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-22 6:10PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-22 5:30PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 894).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Acasio, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 740).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Changed: Representative Nishimoto added as Co-Chair. Representative Perruso discharged as Co-Chair.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Perruso Co-Chairs; Branco, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 453).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Lowen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1807-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Re-referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 32
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Re-referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 31
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Matayoshi voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1137-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd, Matsumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-16-22 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Re-referred to AGR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 23
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 201) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 843) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:35AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Re-Referred to AEN, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 65) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Nishihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 1:00PM in conference room Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Referred to AEN, CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|