|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1099) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 03-18-21 9:15AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to HSG, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 144) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 646) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 206) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-21 1:00PM in conference room 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Referred to HOU, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|