|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Recommitted to Conference committee as amended in CD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) LoPresti excused.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-27-21.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 13) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 13).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Matayoshi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2021
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-21 2:45PM; CR 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Matayoshi Co-Chairs; LoPresti, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Lee, Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 455).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1820), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-30-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1358) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Eli, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Bill re-scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 03-05-21 10:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-05-21 11:10AM.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-03-21 11:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 11
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 7) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 02-10-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 44) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-21 9:30AM in conference room Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|