|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 808).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Nakashima Co-Chairs; D. Kobayashi, Tokioka, Ward.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Keohokalole, Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 790).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 515).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Ohno excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-13-21.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1845) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-30-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1359) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Eli, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Mizuno, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 03-12-21 11:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-10-21 11:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-10-21 11:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 11
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
One Day Notice 02-10-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 56) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-21 9:30AM in conference room Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Referred to JDC .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|