12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 34) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2021 | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-21 3:00PM in conference room 225. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2021 | Referred to HMS, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Introduced. |