|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 211) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 789) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 373) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 1:20PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Referred to PSM, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|