12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/12/2021 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2021 | Reported from EET/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 171) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2021 | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2021 | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | The committee(s) on EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Re-Referred to EET/WTL, WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Referred to EET/WTL, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Introduced. |