12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-21 1:00PM in conference room Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Re-Referred to AEN, CPN. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Referred to AEN/HTH, CPN. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Introduced. |