|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 849).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; English Co-Chair; Nishihara.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Quinlan, Perruso Co-Chairs; Todd, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Deferred One Day 04-13-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 415).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1710), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1434), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Tuesday, 03-23-21 10:15AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on ECD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1077) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to ECD.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to AGR, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 221) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 878) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 11) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|