Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 797).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
House Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-21 10:00AM; CR 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 808).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Nakashima, Cullen Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Rhoads, Kidani Co-Chairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Deferred One Day 04-13-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 416).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1692), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1455) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1058) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 226) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 711) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 10:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 325) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|