12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 299) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 3:00PM in conference room 225. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Re-Referred to HMS, WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Referred to HMS, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Introduced. |