LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB553
Action History
HI
Hawaii Senate Bill SB553
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2022 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB553
Action History
12/10/2021
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Senate
02/17/2021
The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Senate
02/12/2021
The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-21 1:05PM; Via Videoconference.
Senate
01/27/2021
Referred to HTH, JDC.
Senate
01/25/2021
Passed First Reading.
Senate
01/22/2021
Introduced.