12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/16/2021 | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-16-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 53) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 9:15AM in conference room Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Referred to JDC, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Introduced. |