|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to ECD, HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 146) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 764) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-04-21 1:51PM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-04-21 10:05AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-02-21 9:25AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|