12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 282) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 1:30PM in conference room Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Referred to PSM, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Introduced. |