|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2021
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-21 11:05AM; CR 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
House Conferees Appointed: Quinlan, Holt Co-Chairs; Okimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 790).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; English Co-Chair; Nishihara, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 523).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Kapela, Perruso, Tam, Wildberger voting no (5) and Representative(s) Holt, LoPresti, Ohno excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-13-21.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1864) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Tam; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso, Wildberger; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-07-21 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Perruso, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1123), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 233) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
One Day Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 855) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 70) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 1:00PM in conference room Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|