|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1079) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Ichiyama.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:00AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-17-21 at 10:00AM.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-12-21 11:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-10-21 11:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-10-21 11:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-10-21 at 11:30AM.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Bill re-scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 03-05-21 10:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-05-21 11:10AM.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-03-21 11:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Referred to GVR, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 36) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 397) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 9:30AM in conference room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|