12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2021 | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-10-21 9:10AM in conference room Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 9:30AM in conference room Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | Re-Referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Referred to EET, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Introduced. |