|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 23
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 430) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Deferred One Day 03-11-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 923) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-04-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 473) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 3:00PM in conference room 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to LCA, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|