|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:35AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 496) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 9:00AM; 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to HTH/CPN, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|