|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1423) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 243) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Inouye). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Dela Cruz). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 956) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Inouye; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-04-21 10:05AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-24-21 10:05AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-17-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 129) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Inouye; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 3:00PM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to TRS, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|