Senate | 02/16/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2360) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, DeCoite, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference. | ||
12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Referred to TRS, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Introduced. |