|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 37) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
One Day Notice 02-22-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 571) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-16-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 59) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 9:15AM in conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to JDC, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|