|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1482) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Wednesday, 03-17-21 at 10:00 AM .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 03-12-21 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 38) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 572) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-17-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 71) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 1:00PM in conference room Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|