|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to LAT, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 249) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
One Day Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 831) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:35AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 515) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 3:00PM in conference room 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to LCA, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|