12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | The committee on LCA deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Re-Referred to LCA, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-21 3:00PM in conference room 225. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Referred to LCA, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Introduced. |