12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | The committee on HWN deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2021 | The committee(s) on WTL/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 1:00PM in conference room 016. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Referred to WTL/HWN, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Introduced. |