LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB735
Action History
HI
Hawaii Senate Bill SB735
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2022 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB735
Action History
Senate
01/25/2022
The committee(s) on HMS deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-27-22 3:10PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
Senate
01/24/2022
The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-22 3:10PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
12/10/2021
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Senate
01/27/2021
Referred to HMS, WAM.
Senate
01/25/2021
Passed First Reading.
Senate
01/22/2021
Introduced.