12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | The committee(s) on GVO/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 1:00PM in conference room 225. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Referred to GVO/HOU, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Introduced. |