House
|
03/24/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1448-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Costales, Eli, Ichiyama, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno, Woodson.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-23-22 9:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-18-22 10:00AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 03-18-22 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 20) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 02-07-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2051) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-25-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|