|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1105) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 03-18-21 9:15AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 261) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Acasio). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 783) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 211) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-21 1:00PM in conference room 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to HOU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|