|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to JHA, CPC, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 262).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 4 (Senator(s) Fevella, Kidani, Kim, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Deferred One Day 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
One Day Notice 03-05-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 659) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-21 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 180) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 3:05PM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to TRS, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|