|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to HHH, JHA/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 266) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Misalucha). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 727) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:35AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 326) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to PSM, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|