Senate | 02/11/2022 | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-11-22 1:30PM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-22 1:35PM; Via Videoconference. | ||
12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Referred to HTH, JDC/CPN. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Introduced. |