House
|
03/23/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Har, Kapela, LoPresti, Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1296-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-22-22 9:30AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to EEP, JHA, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 22) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 02-09-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2100) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-25-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 30) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2021
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to AEN, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|