|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1379) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-23-21 10:30AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 42) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 399) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Misalucha.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 9:30AM in conference room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|