12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 307) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2021 | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-21 1:00PM; 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Re-Referred to WTL, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2021 | Referred to WTL/PSM, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Introduced. |