12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2021 | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 408) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Kim; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2021 | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 3:05PM in conference room 229. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | Referred to EDU, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Introduced. |