LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB82
Draft Versions
HI
Hawaii Senate Bill SB82
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2022 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB82
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 20, 2021
Compare
Amended
Bill
March 25, 2021
Compare
Bill
March 18, 2021
Compare
Bill
March 3, 2021
Compare
Bill
February 23, 2021
Compare
Bill
February 22, 2021
Compare