12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/16/2021 | The recommendation was not adopted. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2021 | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keohokalole ; 3 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio, Ihara, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2021 | The committee(s) on HWN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-16-21 1:02PM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2021 | Re-Referred to HWN, WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2021 | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to HWN. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2021 | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 228) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to HWN. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | The committee(s) on HWN will hold a public decision making on 02-11-21 1:01PM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Referred to HWN. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2021 | Introduced. |