|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1376) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Takumi, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-23-21 10:30AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 23
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 432) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Deferred One Day 03-11-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 870) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 215) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 1:00PM in conference room 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to HOU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|