House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 88) in amended form (SD 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2850) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2512) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Re-Referred to HRE, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to HRE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2041) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to HRE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
The committee(s) on HRE will hold a public decision making on 02-01-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Referred to HRE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|