|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Wildberger voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1458), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-24-21 2:30PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Wildberger voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 993) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 03-16-21 9:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 21
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 118) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
One Day Notice 03-05-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 740) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 10:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 516) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 3:00PM in conference room 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to LCA, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|