|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1491) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, DeCoite, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 03-24-21 2:15PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HET with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1084) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HET.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Ichiyama.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to GVR, HET, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 301) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 970) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-03-21 10:35AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 513) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2021
|
Re-Referred to HMS, WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to HMS, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|