12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-10-21 1:30PM in conference room Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2021 | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | Referred to HTH, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Introduced. |